California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB493 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill July 7, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015