LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB494
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB494
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB494
Compare Versions
SB494 Chaptered October 11, 2015
SB494 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB494 Amended September 3, 2015
SB494 Amended May 13, 2015
SB494 Amended April 22, 2015
SB494 Amended April 6, 2015
SB494 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB494 Chaptered October 11, 2015
SB494 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB494 Amended September 3, 2015
SB494 Amended May 13, 2015
SB494 Amended April 22, 2015
SB494 Amended April 6, 2015
SB494 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare