|
03/18/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2433.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1245.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1155.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 647.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|