Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | April 15 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 648.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | March 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Set for hearing March 18. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2015 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 12/02/2014 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. | ||
Senate | 12/01/2014 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |