|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 800, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2675.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 16. Page 3026.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
June 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 983.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
April 29 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|