LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB503
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB503
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB503
Compare Versions
SB503 Amended June 30, 2016
SB503 Amended July 16, 2015
SB503 Amended May 5, 2015
SB503 Amended April 20, 2015
SB503 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB503 Amended June 30, 2016
SB503 Amended July 16, 2015
SB503 Amended May 5, 2015
SB503 Amended April 20, 2015
SB503 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare