|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 716, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2370.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 14. Page 2682.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1023.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 907.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|