Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | April 29 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2015 | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |