|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2378.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2638.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 823.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|