LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB513
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB513
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB513
Compare Versions
SB513 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB513 Enrolled September 4, 2015
SB513 Amended August 31, 2015
SB513 Amended August 17, 2015
SB513 Amended June 2, 2015
SB513 Amended May 12, 2015
SB513 Amended April 6, 2015
SB513 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB513 Chaptered October 8, 2015
SB513 Enrolled September 4, 2015
SB513 Amended August 31, 2015
SB513 Amended August 17, 2015
SB513 Amended June 2, 2015
SB513 Amended May 12, 2015
SB513 Amended April 6, 2015
SB513 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare