California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB514 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 19, 2016

Amended

Bill January 26, 2016
Bill January 15, 2016
Bill April 20, 2015