Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Set for hearing May 11. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 823.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |