07/06/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2015. | |||
07/06/2015 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/26/2015 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2015 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2147.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 668.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 595.) (April 14). | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Set for hearing April 14. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |