Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 1). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
July 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 837.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 729.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|