Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | April 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 732.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |