LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB527
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB527
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB527
Compare Versions
SB527 Chaptered September 23, 2016
SB527 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SB527 Amended August 15, 2016
SB527 Amended June 6, 2016
SB527 Amended January 13, 2016
SB527 Amended April 20, 2015
SB527 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB527 Chaptered September 23, 2016
SB527 Enrolled September 6, 2016
SB527 Amended August 15, 2016
SB527 Amended June 6, 2016
SB527 Amended January 13, 2016
SB527 Amended April 20, 2015
SB527 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare