California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB532 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2015

Amended

Bill July 7, 2015
Bill June 12, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015