|
10/06/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 542, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/06/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2658.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2688.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 930.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 729.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|