Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Set for hearing May 11. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | May 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing May 4. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 593.) (April 14). | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Set for hearing April 14. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected March 11). |