LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB549
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB549
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB549
Compare Versions
SB549 Chaptered October 5, 2015
SB549 Enrolled September 4, 2015
SB549 Amended August 28, 2015
SB549 Amended June 23, 2015
SB549 Amended June 2, 2015
SB549 Amended April 28, 2015
SB549 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB549 Chaptered October 5, 2015
SB549 Enrolled September 4, 2015
SB549 Amended August 28, 2015
SB549 Amended June 23, 2015
SB549 Amended June 2, 2015
SB549 Amended April 28, 2015
SB549 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare