LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB55
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB55
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB55
Action History
Senate
02/01/2016
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
01/15/2015
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
01/05/2015
Read first time.
Senate
12/22/2014
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 21.
Senate
12/19/2014
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.