Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2961.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2934.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2886.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2016
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
April 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|