|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 679, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2500.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 2853.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1206.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1156.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 593.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|