Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 07/08/2015 | July 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 3. Page 558.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1702.) (April 8). | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |