LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB561
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB561
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB561
Compare Versions
SB561 Chaptered September 8, 2015
SB561 Enrolled August 24, 2015
SB561 Amended June 17, 2015
SB561 Amended May 12, 2015
SB561 Amended April 20, 2015
SB561 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB561 Chaptered September 8, 2015
SB561 Enrolled August 24, 2015
SB561 Amended June 17, 2015
SB561 Amended May 12, 2015
SB561 Amended April 20, 2015
SB561 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare