California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB562 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 11, 2015

Amended

Bill June 16, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015