Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1324.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1156.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|