Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | April 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 617.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |