Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |