LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB582
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB582
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB582
Compare Versions
SB582 Chaptered September 4, 2015
SB582 Enrolled August 27, 2015
SB582 Amended August 17, 2015
SB582 Amended May 19, 2015
SB582 Amended April 7, 2015
SB582 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB582 Chaptered September 4, 2015
SB582 Enrolled August 27, 2015
SB582 Amended August 17, 2015
SB582 Amended May 19, 2015
SB582 Amended April 7, 2015
SB582 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare