California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB586 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill April 28, 2015