Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing May 4. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 648.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2015 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |