Senate | 02/01/2016 | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2015 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator McGuire. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 982.) (May 13). | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | May 6 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2015 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 732.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. (Corrected April 10). | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |