California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB597 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill May 26, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015