California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB598 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 2, 2015

Amended

Bill June 29, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015