|
09/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 282, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 2569.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1116.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 983.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|