Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 15). (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10))
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1121.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1101.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 525.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|