Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2016 | January 21 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2016 | Set for hearing January 21. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2015 | Set for hearing May 28. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 730.) (April 21). | ||
Senate | 03/20/2015 | Set for hearing April 21. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |