Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | May 13 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2015 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | April 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |