Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | April 22 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 729.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | April 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Set for hearing April 8. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |