Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 12/16/2015 | January 5 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 12/10/2015 | Set for hearing January 5. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | April 7 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Set for hearing April 7. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |