California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB613 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill July 6, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015