Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | April 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |