Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2016 | June 22 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2016 | June 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2914.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2894.) (January 13). | ||
Senate | 01/07/2016 | Set for hearing January 13. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 01/04/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |