California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB620 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 3, 2015

Amended

Bill July 2, 2015
Bill May 7, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015