Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
June 28 set for final hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
June 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
July 14 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
July 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 1070.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1034.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 794.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
April 13 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|