LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB63
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB63
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB63
Compare Versions
SB63 Chaptered October 11, 2015
SB63 Enrolled September 9, 2015
SB63 Amended September 1, 2015
SB63 Amended June 1, 2015
SB63 Amended April 7, 2015
SB63 Amended March 23, 2015
SB63 Introduced January 5, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB63 Chaptered October 11, 2015
SB63 Enrolled September 9, 2015
SB63 Amended September 1, 2015
SB63 Amended June 1, 2015
SB63 Amended April 7, 2015
SB63 Amended March 23, 2015
SB63 Introduced January 5, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare