Senate | 02/01/2016 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | April 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Set for hearing April 28. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Set for hearing April 14. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |