|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 680, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2776.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 3184.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2894.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 1304.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1157.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 858.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 593.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|