|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 719, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2781.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (September 11). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 3191.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1328.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1157.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 816.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 699.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|